MD SB632 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB92
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain person to petition for a peace order against another person whom the petitioner alleges has conducted visual surveillance of areas of the petitioner's residence where the petitioner has a reasonable expectation of privacy.
Title
Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] |
Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Carry Over) 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
HB911 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
HB911 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0632?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0632f.pdf |