MD SB632 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain candidates from petitioning for a recount under certain circumstances; prohibiting a registered voter from filing a petition for a recount based on the certified results of a ballot question under certain circumstances; altering the circumstances under which a certain petitioner for a recount is not liable for the costs of the recount; providing that certain provisions of the Act apply only to persons that accept public campaign financing under certain provisions of law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Contested Elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-12SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {835364/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-17HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {444531/1 Adopted
2021-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB761 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12103(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12107(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12301(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12302(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12304(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12305(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12306(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12307(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12308(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12309(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12310(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12311(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12312(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12313(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13233(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13505(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback