MD HB761 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which a certain petitioner for a recount is not liable for the costs of the recount; providing that certain provisions of the Act apply only to persons that accept public campaign financing under certain provisions of law; providing that a person may accept a donation or make a disbursement related to a contested election only under certain circumstances; requiring that certain unspent public contributions be repaid to a certain government entity; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Postelection Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-10SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {185665/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-01HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB632 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Senate Requests House Recede

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12107(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12301(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12302(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12304(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12305(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12306(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12307(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12308(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12309(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12310(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12311(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12312(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law12313(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13233(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law13505(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback