MD SB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain newly constructed dwellings in Baltimore City, subject to certain limitations; expanding the tax credit program to authorize the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, the property tax credit to certain owners of certain substantially rehabilitated dwellings; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted on or after July 1, 2025; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ivey) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ivey) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ivey) Adopted (128-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795869/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {439438/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1189 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore City
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |