MD HB1189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain newly constructed dwellings in Baltimore City, subject to certain limitations; expanding the tax credit program to authorize the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, the property tax credit to certain owners of certain substantially rehabilitated dwellings; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted on or after July 1, 2025; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Subjects
Baltimore City
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1189?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1189f.pdf |