MD SB624 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the wine festival license in Calvert County to be the beer or wine festival license; establishing that beer festivals and beer and wine festivals are subject to specified authorizations and requirements applicable to wine festivals; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Calvert County to issue the beer or wine festival license to specified alcoholic beverages license holders or a nonprofit organization; authorizing the Board to approve up to 4 weekends each year for beer or wine festivals per applicant; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713697/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444539/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
Fairs
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
Fairs
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Time