MD SB618 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins, and Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins, and Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to award credit to a high school student who completes work-based training or classroom instruction under a registered apprenticeship program; authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time certain apprentices spend during certain work-based training with certain employers; requiring the State Board of Education to report on progress, by high school and community college, toward the attainment of certain goals; etc.
Title
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins, and Rose |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-09 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {185669/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {554734/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Apprentices
Budget and Management, Department of
Credit
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Higher Education
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Credit
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Higher Education
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Students
Work, Labor and Employment