MD SB613 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending, from October 1, 2024, to July 1, 2026, the date by which individuals must be licensed by the State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators before practicing as an assisted living manager in the State; altering the requirements for the manager training course that certain assisted living managers are required to complete to include in-person courses, virtual training methods, or a combination of both; and altering the requirements for serving as an interim assisted living manager.
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483021/1 Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {693428/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB874 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 19 | 1807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 9 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 9 | 3A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 9 | 3A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 9 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |