MD SB612 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB95
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 5% to 6%, the maximum hotel rental tax rate that counties in the Eastern Shore class of code counties may impose.
Title
Eastern Shore Code Counties - Maximum Hotel Rental Tax Rate - Alteration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hershey) Adopted
HB931 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Referred Budget and Taxation
HB931 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |