MD SB610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the dates by which certain percentages of accessible rooms in a lodging establishment are required to be furnished with a bed of a certain height.
Title
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260 |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-29 | House | Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Wilson) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 15 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 15 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |