MD SB610 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the circumstances under which the Workers' Compensation Commission retains jurisdiction pending an appeal of a Commission order to include a request for approval of a proposed settlement of all or part of a claim.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Jurisdiction Pending Appeal - Proposed Settlement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Finance |