MD SB606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Kent County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Kent County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB456 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2B-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |