MD HB456 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Kent County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Kent County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2B-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |