MD SB604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts in Cecil County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart in Cecil County may operate the golf cart only on certain highways at certain times and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in Cecil County to keep as far to the right of the roadway as feasible and possess a valid driver's license; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB575 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Boundaries
Cecil County
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Cecil County
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 104.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0604?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0604f.pdf |