MD SB604 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing specified protections for interns and applicants for internships from specified discriminatory acts; providing that a specified intern has access to a specified complaint resolution procedure or, under specified circumstances, may file a complaint with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights for specified nonmonetary administrative remedies; providing that the Act does not create an employment relationship between an employer and an intern for the purposes of specified remedies or specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for Interns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288575/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Advertising
Discrimination
Harassment
Human Relations
Job Training
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Harassment
Human Relations
Job Training
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment