MD SB594 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the State Law Library to be the Thurgood Marshall State Law Library; providing that the Thurgood Marshall State Law Library is the successor of the State Law Library; providing that certain names and titles of a certain unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; providing for the continuity of certain matters and persons; etc.
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903521/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Annotated Code of Maryland
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Names
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Annotated Code of Maryland
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Names
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials