MD SB591 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of the prohibition on including a noncompete or conflict of interest provision in an employment contract or similar document or agreement that restricts the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade.
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Provisions - Application of Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-33) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Contracts
Ethics
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Ethics
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |