MD SB590 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a health benefit plan certified by the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange as a qualified health plan from providing coverage for an abortion; and establishing an exception.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Abortion Coverage - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2012-03-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0590.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0590f.pdf |