MD SB59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 25% the minimum percentage of a unit's total dollar value of contracts that are, to the extent practicable, to be made directly to small businesses; providing that certain preferences do not apply to certain procurement contracts; requiring a certain unit to apply a 5% percentage price preference on certain procurement contracts designated for the small business reserve under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0059?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0059f.pdf |