MD SB59 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from December 1 to January 31 the date by which the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy must submit its annual report to the General Assembly on the activities of the preceding calendar year; and clarifying the contents of the report.
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Reporting Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-15 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |