MD SB579 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a certain formula for the calculation of a certain child support obligation under the child support guidelines when a parent with shared physical custody keeps the child or children overnight for more than 25%, at least 92 overnights, but less than 30%, not more than 109 overnights, of the year; applying the Act only to cases filed on or after October 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support - Shared Physical Custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 143
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-21HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-02-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-31SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB269 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 142

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law12201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law12204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback