MD SB575 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that specified references to individual retirement accounts include traditional and Roth individual retirement accounts; clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System who resumes employment before a specified date may resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection if the employer participates in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; providing that specified retirees of the Judges' Retirement System are exempt from a specified reemployment earnings limitation; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Griffith) {653429/1 Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779332/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Fire Protection
Interest
Judges
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Fire Protection
Interest
Judges
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment