MD SB575 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to report on the status of the Maryland Clean Water Fund to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 15 of each year.
Title
Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual Report
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204538/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Conservation
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sediment Control
Water
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sediment Control
Water