MD SB568 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain persons who are required to provide notice of suspected abuse or neglect of a child or make a written report of suspected abuse or neglect of a child may not knowingly fail to provide the required notice or make the required written report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a fine of up to $10,000 or imprisonment not to exceed 3 years or both; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {542513/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {438172/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0568?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0568f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0568t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0568e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_53_sb0568e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0568_43817201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0568_54251301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0568.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0568_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0530.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0568_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1362.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1246.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback