MD SB563 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on receipt of a specified permit application, to give notice immediately or require the applicant to give notice immediately by certified mail to specified counties and municipal corporations and to specified members of the General Assembly; requiring an applicant for a specified incinerator or landfill system to give notice of the application, informational meeting, and hearings to specified counties and municipal corporations and to members of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {124933/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Hearings
High Voltage Lines
Licenses
Notices
Postal Service
Public Service Commission
Refuse Disposal
Utilities
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Hearings
High Voltage Lines
Licenses
Notices
Postal Service
Public Service Commission
Refuse Disposal
Utilities