MD SB56 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that specified carriers make available a Medicare supplement policy plan I to specified individuals if an application for a Medicare supplement policy or certificate is submitted during specified time periods; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policies - Repeal of Requirement to
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-01-25 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Finance | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |