MD SB550 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB904

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans to provide funds to local nonprofit organizations to establish and expand community behavioral health programs to serve members, veterans and their families; requiring the Department of Health to administer the Program and to establish a statewide system to assess the services provided by the nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Governor to provide $2,500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans – Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-31SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2021-01-26SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

SB904 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
HB872 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback