MD HB872 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1515

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans to provide funds to local nonprofit organizations to establish and expand community behavioral health programs to serve members, veterans and their families; requiring the Department of Health to administer the Program and to establish a statewide system to assess the services provided by the nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Governor to provide $2,500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sheila E. Hixson Behavioral Health Services Matching Grant Program for Service Members and Veterans - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-06SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-22SenateReferred Finance Budget and Taxation
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (133-1)
2021-03-20HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-20HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-04HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB550 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
HB1515 (Carry Over) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General5210(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback