MD SB55 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue certain special disabled veteran registration plates to disabled veterans who are between 50% and 99%, inclusive, service-connected disabled as designated or classified by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs; prohibiting the Administration from charging certain persons the fee required for replacement registration plates under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Disabled Veteran Registration Plates - Issuance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {163120/1 Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB178 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Buses
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Physically Disabled Persons
Rules and Regulations
Transfer of Goods
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Veterans
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Physically Disabled Persons
Rules and Regulations
Transfer of Goods
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 619.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |