MD SB547 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a separate criminal offense for each nuisance organism imported or possessed in violation of specified provisions of law or regulation; and establishing a total maximum fine of $25,000 for offenses arising out of the same enforcement action.
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {260812/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204539/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Environmental Matters
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Judges
Natural Resources - Generally
Penalties and Sentences
Environmental Matters
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Judges
Natural Resources - Generally
Penalties and Sentences