MD SB545 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities; requiring the Task Force to study achievements made in the past 20 years in combating substandard canine breeding practices and current efforts and standards relating to canine breeding; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations and report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-02-03SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-29SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-26SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback