MD SB531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Caroline County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Caroline County to issue the license to a holder of a certain barbershop or beauty salon permit; establishing a licensing fee of $100; etc.
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB362 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Awareness and Outreach
Barbers
Boundaries
Caroline County
Cosmetologists
Fees
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Substance Abuse
Time
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Awareness and Outreach
Barbers
Boundaries
Caroline County
Cosmetologists
Fees
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Substance Abuse
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 15 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 15 | 1001.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 15 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |