MD SB531 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program to assist families and individuals who are experiencing, or who are in imminent danger of, a housing crisis in obtaining and maintaining permanent housing; requiring the Governor, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to include an appropriation for the Program of $516,828 in the annual budget each fiscal year beginning in fiscal year 2019; etc.
Title
Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-3) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-3) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-3) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {890113/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {227772/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Emergencies
Governor
Housing
Human Resources, Department of
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
Appropriations
Budgets
Emergencies
Governor
Housing
Human Resources, Department of
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally