MD SB531 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Task Force on Military Service Members, Veterans, and the Courts; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; providing that a member of the Task Force may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study military service-related mental health issues and substance abuse problems and to make recommendations on or before December 1, 2012, concerning the establishment of a special court for defendants who are military members or veterans; etc.
Title
Task Force on Military Service Members, Veterans, and the Courts
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] |
Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Mental Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Mental Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of