MD SB520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the imposition of a maximum number of subscribers to community solar energy generating system under the Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program; providing for an increase in the generating capacity and capacity limits to be included in the pilot program; altering the termination date of the pilot program to be not sooner than December 31, 2024; and extending to July 1, 2022, the submission date of a certain report on the pilot program to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-36) (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-36) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |