MD SB520 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to the prohibition against a person operating a bicycle or a motor scooter on a roadway where the posted maximum speed limit exceeds 50 miles an hour; and authorizing a person who is lawfully operating a bicycle or a motor scooter on a shoulder adjacent to a roadway for which the posted maximum speed limit exceeds 50 miles an hour to enter the roadway only if making or attempting to make a left turn, crossing through an intersection, or the shoulder is overlaid with specified directional markings.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways
Sponsors
Sen. James Robey [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |