MD SB520 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that under specified circumstances a homeowner who is an employee of the federal government stationed outside the State may qualify for the homestead property tax credit for a dwelling even though the homeowner does not live in the dwelling for the required period of time.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligibility of Employees of the Federal
Sponsors
Sen. James Robey [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |