MD SB515 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making specified provisions of law that relate to collective bargaining for State employees apply to firefighters for the Martin State Airport at the rank of captain or below who are employed by the Military Department; and altering specified provisions of law that relate to collective bargaining for specified firefighters for the Martin State Airport

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182
2017-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (100-39)
2017-03-31HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-31HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-31HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2017-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-10HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2017-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2017-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {787478/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0515&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0515f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0515t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_182_sb0515t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0515_78747801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0515.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0515_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0515_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,s-0484&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0515,h-1109&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback