MD SB509 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that the ethics provisions required to be enacted by Prince George's County shall prohibit a person from lobbying the county government for contingent compensation, prohibit the county government from issuing a credit card to specified officials, prohibit an elected county official from soliciting specified persons to provide a monetary benefit to specified other persons, make specified changes to the board of ethics, and provide for meetings of the board of ethics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Ethics Reforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-12 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-05 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2011-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-08 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2011-03-24 First Reading Environmental Matters
2011-04-06 Returned Passed
2011-03-25 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-03-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-02-16 Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-04 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback