MD SB508 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1006
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to produce consumable help products for sale by the person; and requiring the person offering a consumable hemp product for sale to ensure that the consumable help product is tested by a State-authorized cannabis or hemp testing laboratory to ensure the consumable hemp product meets applicable safety standards and the tetrahydrocannabinol content of the consumable hemp product does not exceed 0.5 milligrams of tetrahydrocannabinol per serving or 2.5 milligrams of tetrahydrocannabinol per package.
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Consumable Hemp Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123126/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123126/1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123126/1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-02-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB1006 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (132-0)
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Laboratories
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Laboratories
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 14 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 14 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 14 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |