MD SB508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the Board of County Commissioners of Washington County to borrow not more than $60,000,000 in order to finance the cost of the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Washington County and to effect that borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Washington County
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Washington County