MD SB507 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the establishment of a certain health savings account; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain health savings accounts; providing that a health savings account is established on the first day that an individual becomes covered under a high deductible health plan; requiring a health savings account to be opened with a trustee or custodian within a certain time period; and clarifying that a health savings account is established regardless of certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-12HouseHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-27HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments {417670/1 Adopted
2020-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-01-31SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB671 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts14501(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15144(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback