MD SB502 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the Maryland Constitution increasing to 73 from 70 the mandatory retirement age for judges under specified circumstances; proposing an addition to the Maryland Constitution to provide for the application of specified amendments to the Maryland Constitution; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-4) (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-4) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {898071/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |