MD SB501 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to follow certain procedures for its open meetings; requiring each open meeting to be made publicly available through live video streaming; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance, by April 15 each year, to notify each student of the decision regarding the Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Educational Excellence Award; stating the intent of the General Assembly for the reorganization of the Commission to establish the Office as a separate independent agency; etc.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Procedures and Operations - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983325/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1030 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Subjects
Electronic Communication
Forms
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
meetings
Mobile Devices
Notices
Public Information
Recordings
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students
Time
Video
Forms
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
meetings
Mobile Devices
Notices
Public Information
Recordings
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students
Time
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 13 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |