MD SB50 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain final order of the Commission on Civil Rights on a complaint alleging a discriminatory act is appealable in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Human Relations - Commission on Civil Rights - Appeal of Final Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {773122/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB394 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Subjects
Appeals
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commission on Civil Rights
Discrimination
Human Relations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commission on Civil Rights
Discrimination
Human Relations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |