MD SB499 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition on the sale, distribution, and disposal of certain drugs, medicines, pharmaceutical preparations, and medical preparations by means of a vending machine or similar device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26SenateMotion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable
2021-02-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-01-26SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB107 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Referred Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation3103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211111(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211112(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211204(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General211212(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback