MD SB497 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the period of time, from 1 year to 2 years, by which a video lottery operation licensee must notify the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission of its intent to reapply for a video lottery operation license; altering the membership of specified video lottery facility local development councils to include 15 members appointed by the chief executive of the specified county, in consultation with the Senators and Delegates who represent the communities surrounding the facility and specified other entities; etc.
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {739232/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
County Commissioners
County Councils
County Executives
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Notices
Public Officials
Time
Video
Community Development
County Commissioners
County Councils
County Executives
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Notices
Public Officials
Time
Video