MD SB487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain incarcerated person from violating a condition of pretrial or posttrial release or other pretrial or posttrial condition prohibiting the person from contacting, harassing, or abusing an alleged victim or going in or near an alleged victim's residence or place of employment.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Pretrial or Posttrial Condition by Incarcerated Person - Victim Contact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533625/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB411 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 213.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |