MD HB411 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain incarcerated person from violating a condition of pretrial or posttrial release or other pretrial or posttrial condition prohibiting the person from contacting, harassing, or abusing an alleged victim or going in or near an alleged victim's residence or place of employment.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Pretrial or Posttrial Condition by Incarcerated Person - Victim Contact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 213.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |