MD SB487 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an application for a salvage certificate submitted by an insurance company to be accompanied by a specified affidavit of ownership and evidence of final payment instead of a certificate of title if the certificate of title is defective, lost, or destroyed.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Salvage - Defective, Lost, or Destroyed Certificates of Title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |